THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, KETTERING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of Christian faith. 2. To relieve poverty, hardship, sickness and disease. 3. To assist in the treatment of those in need. 4. To promote the interests of social welfare amongst adults, children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 01 September 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST. ANDREW'S PCC, KETTERING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Thomas Michael Houston | Chair | 24 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Merrifield | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Hilary Janet Whitwell | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elisabeth Burrows | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Karina Tones | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Ingram | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Bell | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Revd Canon Brian James Withington | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Jones | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Kay Carter | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Bethany Claire Roberts | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Carter | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Maple | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM GEORGE DICKENSON | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Harradine | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE LAWRENCE | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Cox | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Clare Smith | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.17k | £132.06k | £130.16k | £176.83k | £261.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.33k | £98.57k | £135.86k | £137.03k | £196.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 St. Peters Avenue
Kettering
NN16 0HA
- Phone:
- 07815523428
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window