THE LODGE ACTION SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Summary of the main activities include; Developing and running activities, events, programmes and coaching sessions that have been available to hard to reach group such as: disengaged pupils at local secondary schools, deprived areas, young people with learning disabilities and inactive groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 27 March 2015: CIO registration
- THE LODGE INDOOR SKATEPARK & YOUTH CAFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA TAYLOR | Chair | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chris Leeds He/Him | Trustee | 30 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Corbiere | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hawman | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.81k | £63.69k | £66.22k | £49.02k | £57.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.11k | £45.54k | £59.34k | £57.37k | £60.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.14k | £23.42k | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWTON ABBOT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ROLLER-SKATING, SKATEBOARDING AND BMX BIKING, FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LODGE INDOOR SKATEPARK
WHARF ROAD
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 2DA
- Phone:
- 01626 438353
- Email:
- hello@lodgeskatepark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window