THE RASCHE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to advance a broad range of charitable activities, with a particular focus on the advancement of education, health and the relief of those in need by reason of ill health or disability. In particular, the charity supports organisations based in North and West Yorkshire and those with whom it has an existing relationship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANTHONY RASCHE | Chair | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Rasche | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNSEY HELEN ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE LOUISE CONNOLLY | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK RASCHE | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.28k | £33.98k | £58.90k | £25.63k | £83.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.10k | £156.50k | £220.44k | £168.49k | £151.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO MAKE GRANTS TO: (I) ADVANCE EDUCATION; (II) ADVANCE HEALTH; AND (III) RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wrigleys Solicitors LLP
3 Wellington Place
LEEDS
LS1 4AP
- Phone:
- 01132045747
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window