Governing document REDEEMED CAMP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2018 as amended on 10 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects (?Objects?) are to further such exclusively charitable purposes under the law of England and Wales in any part of the world, within a Christian ethos, as the Directors may in their discretion think fit, and in particular (without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing): (a)The advancement of the Christian faith for the public benefit in accordance with the holy bible. (b) to relieve those in need by reason of financial hardship and sickness by providing or assisting in the provision of grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations with similar objects and by providing all the necessary support designed to enable individuals generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient. (c) to advance education by providing learning tools, educational resources, training programmes.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.