TESTLANDS SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
United in our common goal; every child, irrelevant of their starting points, deserve an opportunity and a chance to experience success, not only in school but also in life. We believe, as the Testlands Support Project (TSP) that sport and education can unite to provide exactly this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 19 May 2015: Standard registration
- TSP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Newman | Chair | 31 January 2011 |
|
|||||
Mark Bigwood | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah-Jane Carmelita Challis | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS CRIS LEWIS BA (ED) | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE CROOK BA HONOURS | Trustee | 31 January 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.27k | £139.60k | £272.32k | £165.99k | £19.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.45k | £60.79k | £307.91k | £227.05k | £25.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £6.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2025 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR OF YOUNG PEOPLE; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO SCHOOLS, GROUPS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Testlands Hub
Green Lane
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 9FQ
- Phone:
- 02382026700
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window