VOLUNTEER ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer Action is a local charity that provides a Community Car Service and Befriending services to people living in north east Northamptonshire. The service helps ensure elderly, infirm and disabled people in the community access some of the vital services they need to remain independent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,630 from 2 government contract(s) and £17,098 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
146 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 March 2015: CIO registration
- 04 January 2017: Funds received from 1056760 VOLUNTEER ACTION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Cashmore | Chair | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Sandra Church | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Pick | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard George Allinson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LLoyd Martin | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moira Froggatt | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Wallace | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.47k | £108.00k | £92.12k | £114.70k | £173.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.37k | £105.00k | £122.79k | £148.43k | £164.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £19.16k | £20.94k | £15.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.07k | £22.00k | N/A | £8.00k | £17.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EAST NORTHAMPTONSHIRE,AND ANY OTHER AREA WITHIN THE JURISDICTION OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME, AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES HEREINAFTER CONSTITUTED SHALL DETERMINE, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ENCOURAGING VOLUNTARY WORK WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING POVERTY, THE SICK AND THE AGED IN THE SAID AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLETTON HOUSE
GLAPTHORN ROAD
OUNDLE
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4JA
- Phone:
- 01832275433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window