FRIENDS OF THE UNION CHAIN BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE OF THE UNION CHAIN BRIDGE IN THE PARISHES OF HORNCLIFFE (NORTHUMBERLAND) ENGLAND, AND HUTTON (BERWICKSHIRE), SCOTLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northumberland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2015: CIO registration
- FUCB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTHA VERONICA ANDREWS | Chair | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Humphrey | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Elizabeth Jeanne Edgerton | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sadie Holland | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Mary Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Armstrong Simpson | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Woodrow | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KEDWYN JONES | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Oates Cawthorn | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360.88k | £3.81k | £15.48k | £5.54k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25k | £8.32k | £320.61k | £6.01k | £59.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 16 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL, NATURAL AND MAN-MADE ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE OF THE UNION CHAIN BRIDGE ("THE BRIDGE") IN THE PARISHES OF HORNCLIFFE, NORTHUMBERLAND, ENGLAND AND HUTTON, BERWICKSHIRE, SCOTLAND AND OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH THE BRIDGE IS SITUATED. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE HERITAGE OF THE BRIDGE BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE BRIDGE BY MEANS OF PUBLICATIONS, PUBLIC LECTURES AND EXHIBITIONS AND CO-OPERATION WITH SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND OTHER BODIES AND SOCIETIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAIN BRIDGE HOUSE
HORNCLIFFE
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
TD15 2XT
- Phone:
- 01289382541
- Email:
- unionbridgefriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window