Accounts and annual returns THE FABULOUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 10 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 09 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 09 February 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 02 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 02 February 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 07 February 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 07 February 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window