Financial history THE FABULOUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £35.02k £71.87k £1.24k £2.35k £1.30k
Total expenditure £32.37k £69.92k £6.06k £2.35k £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A