B.L.I.Z.E. ALL BREED RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2015: Standard registration
- 28 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2017 | 01/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.03k | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.31k | £4.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2018 | 03 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2017 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/07/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window