BRISTOL INSIGHT MEDITATION

Charity number: 1162182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- Introductory courses on Insight meditation practice - Teacher led meditation practice courses - Teacher led retreat meditation days - Weekly evening sitting group, combining practice and discussion to support individual practice - Monthly day time sitting group. - Monthly 'self led' day retreats - Monthly group to support focusing practice.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £13,748
Total expenditure: £14,387

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • Cardiff
  • Gloucestershire
  • Newport City
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BRISTOL INSIGHT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nadja Klose Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Madeleine Surekha Longley Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Morag Rose Ruffell Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Dr Lesley Wye Trustee 07 July 2020
FREELY GIVEN RETREATS
Received: On time
Christine Elizabeth Ramsey-Wade Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.31k £2.24k £5.22k £15.92k £13.75k
Total expenditure £3.80k £2.00k £5.62k £12.48k £14.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 05 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 05 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 November 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 November 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
93 Stonebridge Park
BRISTOL
BS5 6RN
Phone:
07742736350