Financial history 1ST ATHERTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 505972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.87k £11.42k £3.53k £2.59k £12.85k
Total expenditure £6.62k £4.58k £4.59k £7.15k £15.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.05k N/A N/A N/A