Financial history 1ST DUDDON DALTON CHURCH SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 505973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.95k £19.54k £6.10k £10.43k £27.47k
Total expenditure £8.75k £7.84k £7.09k £10.60k £9.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £1.00k £2.00k