CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN COMMUNITY HEALTH SUPPORT FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Forum is to raise the profile of health and well being within the Caribbean&African community.The Objectives involves promoting awareness of the major health issues such as heart disease, diabetes, hypertension, mental health, stroke, & prostate cancer. CACHSF conducts research and acts as a first port of call for the exchange of health promoting/information amongst the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 July 2015: Standard registration
- CACHSF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Lee Denton | Trustee | 05 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Silbert Mervin Blake | Trustee | 05 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leroy Edwards | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Akrofi | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deloreta Williams | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.13k | £30.07k | £35.06k | £36.00k | £22.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.26k | £22.46k | £31.61k | £18.00k | £28.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.73k | £1.94k | N/A | £29.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 22 May 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN SUFFOLK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, HEALTH ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING ON HEALTH ISSUES AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HEALTH ISSUES INCLUDING SICKLE CELL ANAEMIA AND LUPUS THAT AFFECT THE CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown Hall Chambers
No 10 Crown Street
Ipswich
Suffolk
IP1 3LD
- Phone:
- 07507255251
- Email:
- Cachsf100@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window