Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLES MASON AND NAOMI WILKINSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165067
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 October 2024 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 October 2024 260 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 April 2023 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 April 2023 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 April 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 19 April 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window