ST. ANDREW'S METHODIST CHURCH, BUSHEY HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Methodist Church in Bushey Heath which holds regular services of worship, maintains a Christian witness to the neighbourhood, supports the work of the Methodist Church in this country and overseas and serves the local community, in particular by providing facilities for a variety of activities engaged in by both children and adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £680 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 August 2015: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Donna Fowler-Marchant | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MICHAEL WOOD | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN WRIGHT | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr HAZEL APPLETON B.SC.PH.D. | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUGH MARKHAM-JONES | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN MARKHAM-JONES | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHRISTOPHER WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FRANCIS WILLIAM DEW TATTERSALL | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE ELIZABETH WOOD | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.45k | £40.93k | £20.69k | £26.45k | £42.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.47k | £64.02k | £27.90k | £34.61k | £43.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £680 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Capel Road
WATFORD
HERTS
WD19 4FE
- Phone:
- 01923210132
- Email:
- minister@samcbh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window