BLACKPOOL SMILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet every Tuesday morning for lively chat, support, gentle exercise and low impact exercise such as yoga & pilates. These exercises and stretches are specifically tailored for people living with a chronic pain condition and may be carried out seated. Meetings are held at Cherry Tree Community Centre, Cherry Tree Gardens, Marton, Blackpool. FY4 4PY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN CHRISTIAN | Chair | 26 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Roberts | Trustee | 26 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28k | £3.18k | £6.53k | £2.24k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54k | £3.47k | £1.28k | £1.61k | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL GOOD HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CHRONIC PAIN IN BLACKPOOL, FYLDE AND WYRE IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE (AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE BLACKPOOL FYLDE AND WYRE HOSPITALS' PAIN MANAGEMENT PROGRAMME(S)) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, MEDICAL REFERRALS, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE ON WAYS TO MANAGE PAIN, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CHRONIC PAIN AND ITS MANAGEMENT; 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM CHRONIC PAIN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Fairmont Drive
Hambleton
Poulton-le-Fylde
FY6 9EF
- Phone:
- 01253702343
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window