Trustees THE BURNS PRICE FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 1161930

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KEVIN PRICE BA | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Bramwell | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John-Daniel Price | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Marie Grace Eggleton | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Jason Price | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDITH MARGARET PRICE MBE | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rt. Rev Peter Bryan Price | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Sims | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.