THE TIM FIELD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162273
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides advice and guidance on how to deal with bullying at work, and offers training to those who wish to remove it from their workplace.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020

Total income: £47
Total expenditure: £246

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2015: CIO registration
  • 12 November 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 12 November 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BULLYONLINE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.06k £2 £148 £64 £47
Total expenditure £96 £292 £387 £272 £246
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 August 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On Time