STOCKPORT MUSLIM FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) The advancement of Islam in accordance with Sunni tradition and according to the Hanafi Barelvi school of Islamic jurisprudence. 2) To act as a resource for people up to 18 years old living in Stockport by providing advice and organising programmes of physical, educational & other activities. 3) The relief of those in need by reason of their age, ill health, disability and financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockport
Governance
- 09 October 2015: Standard registration
- SMF (Working name)
- STOCKPORT MUSLIM FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iqbal Mendi Hussain | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Haque | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tahir Jamal Abbasi | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
WAQUAS KAUSHAL | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
YASAR ANWAR KAUSHAL | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HABIB AHMED | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD KAZIM RAZA | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.22k | £62.85k | £65.29k | £89.88k | £95.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.01k | £67.46k | £56.24k | £94.63k | £99.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.12k | £8.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 24 September 2024 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 24 September 2024 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 October 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 October 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUNNI TRADITION AND ACCORDING TO THE HANAFI BARELVI SCHOOL OF ISLAMIC JURISPRUDENCE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED) TO FACILITATING AND ORGANISING EACH THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE INDIVIDUAL AND COMMUNAL DAILY PRAYERS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?SALAAT?) (B) THE COMMUNAL PRAYER MADE ON FRIDAYS (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?JUMAAH?) (C) THE REGULAR COMMUNAL GATHERINGS FOR THE REMEMBRANCE OF GOD AND FOR THE RECITATION OF EXTRACTS OF THE QURAN (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?ZIKR?). (D) THE COLLECTIVE OFFERING OF PEACE AND BLESSINGS UPON THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) BOTH IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING THE COMMUNAL DAILY PRAYERS AND THE COMMUNAL FRIDAY PRAYER AND OTHERWISE (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS PRAYING ?DUROOD SHAREEF?); (E) THE REMEMBRANCE AND CELEBRATION OF THE BIRTH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?EID MILAD UN NABI?); (F) THE COMMUNAL FUNERAL PRAYER (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?JANAZAA?) AND PRAYERS OF REMEMBRANCE FOR THE DECEASED (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?KHATAMS?); (G) THE MONTHLY PRAYERS AS AN ACT OF REMEMBRANCE AND BLESSINGS FOR SAYYIDUNA SHEIKH ABDUL QAADIR JILANI (MAY GOD BE PLEASED WITH HIM) IN EACH ISLAMIC CALENDAR MONTH (MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?GHIYARWEEN SHAREEF?) (H) THE REMEMBRANCE AND CELEBRATION OF ALL THE SAINTS ACCEPTED BY MUSLIMS FOLLOWING THE HANAFI BARELVI SCHOOL OF ISLAMIC JURISPRUDENCE (MAY GOD BE PLEASED WITH THEM) (BEING COLLECTIVELY MORE COMMONLY KNOWN AS ?AULIA ALLAH?); (I) THE PRAISING AND OFFERING OF BLESSINGS UPON THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) THROUGH THE RECITATION OF POETRY AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS; (J) SUCH OTHER PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND EDUCATIONAL AND/OR RELIGIOUS EVENTS AS THE MEMBERS MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. 4.2 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN STOCKPORT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 4.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor, Mercury House
246 Finney Lane
Heald Green
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 3QD
- Phone:
- 07879453785
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window