SHOEBOX THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our yearly activity focusses on our commitment to promoting the arts in Swindon and the surrounding areas, with specific interest in new work and contemporary performance, by offering quality arts education, as well as providing an affordable venue and support, to develop and share new works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- WRONG SHOES THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.12k | £45.29k | £49.99k | £5.89k | £23 | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.42k | £49.93k | £22.04k | £20.40k | £15.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | £7.43k | £4.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 May 2015 as amended on 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES, DIVERSITY IN AND ACCESS TO CONTEMPORARY THEATRE (AND NEW WORKS OF THEATRE) IN WILTSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES; (B) PROMOTING COLLABORATION WITHIN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING CROSS ART-FORM, INTER-CULTURAL AND CROSS GENERATIONAL WORKING PRACTICES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ACCESSIBLE AND AFFORDABLE ARTS EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN WILTSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window