Trustees WHITE WALTHAM CRICKET CLUB
Charity number: 1161543

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Giles Mahoney | Chair | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whitney | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Callum George Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harpreet Dhillon | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Murphy | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SALMON | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ELLIOTT | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUKE BEARD | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON EDWARD JESSUP | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.