FUNDING FOR THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding for the Future aims to achieve economic empowerment and poverty alleviation in Zimbabwe. We achieve this by empowering Zimbabwe's entrepreneurs to build successful and sustainable business ventures through our mentorship program, business skills training and peer support groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA RUMBIDZAI MACHAYA | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ife | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR H BARTRAM | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 846 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 846 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1211 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1211 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN ZIMBABWE, AND IN PARTICULAR IN HARARE, ZIMBABWE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Heathfield Road
Ashford
TN24 8QD
- Phone:
- 07824479571
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window