BROUGHTON ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a community space to be used for activities that benefit the community including by promoting social interaction, integration and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 January 2016: CIO registration
- BRCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Rose | Chair | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah King | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Amer Alam | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sameeda Ramzan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ruksana Mahmmod | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ERIKA SYMS | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PETER MADELEY | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
TAHIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.92k | £32.80k | £36.81k | £27.57k | £27.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.23k | £7.61k | £30.84k | £44.45k | £38.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £3.50k | £3.17k | £812 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 September 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 September 2021 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE "BROUGHTON ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE" ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BROUGHTON ROAD, SKIPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broughton Road Community Centre
Broughton Road
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 1TU
- Phone:
- 01756793522
- Email:
- tahir1.hussain@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window