Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE EAST END FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity Number: 1161205
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 April 2021 | 60 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window