Financial history POTTEN END PRE-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1164830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £102.68k £128.91k £123.86k £121.50k £113.12k
Total expenditure £113.13k £105.11k £117.37k £118.28k £129.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.55k £6.25k N/A N/A