Financial history MARKET HARBOROUGH DRAMA SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1162014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £68.65k £25.04k £85.41k £128.90k £145.87k
Total expenditure £77.11k £34.36k £105.78k £112.35k £141.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.00k £2.67k N/A N/A