Trustees MARKET HARBOROUGH DRAMA SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1162014

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Barrass | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lloyd | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Ruscoe | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Raymakers | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Scannel | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita Kimmet | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Waller | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Waller | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Jane Kempster | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.