Thanet Community Churches

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church seeks to be a community that 'loves God, loves each other and loves Thanet'. To share the good news of Jesus and compassionately care for 'the least, the last and the lost' in our district. Relieving poverty and hardship, creating community, educating and sharing wisdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 04 September 2015: CIO registration
- COMMUNITY CHURCH RAMSGATE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAUL RICHARD GAMMANS | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
David John Parkinson | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Mussett | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Graham Lamberton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.32k | £232.92k | £216.55k | £220.97k | £320.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.55k | £192.52k | £208.34k | £238.71k | £278.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £25.94k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Sep 2015 as amended on 30 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED HERETO TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Corner
60 Whitehall Road
RAMSGATE
CT12 6DF
- Phone:
- 01843482015
- Email:
- info@thanetcc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window