ARYA SAMAJ (VEDIC MISSION) WEST MIDLANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Weekly Congregations/Prayers. 2. Daily Prayer. 3. Weekly Friends Group gatherings for all ages/gendres and races. 4. Free Yoga/Meditation and Aasana (Postures) Sessions to help stay active & healthy. 5. Childrens' Dance classes to enhance community spirit and keep away from street Menace. 6. National, Cultural and Community festivals/ Events. 7. Bereavement Councelling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 26 June 1978: Standard registration
- 20 May 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 May 2014: Funds transferred to 1156785 ARYA SAMAJ(VEDIC MISSION) WEST MIDLANDS
- VEDIC MISSION (ARYA SAMAJ) WEST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.54k | £80.90k | £65.87k | £65.48k | £66.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.69k | £71.71k | £62.32k | £70.40k | £66.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 24 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 07 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 21 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 19TH JULY 1981, 1 SEPTEMBER 1991, 5 JULY 1992, 3 JULY 1994 AND 7 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AND TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL, SPIRITUAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window