Governing document ARYA SAMAJ (VEDIC MISSION) WEST MIDLANDS
Charity number: 506019
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 19TH JULY 1981, 1 SEPTEMBER 1991, 5 JULY 1992, 3 JULY 1994 AND 7 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AND TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL, SPIRITUAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.