WEST LEIGH SWIM SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a wide range of swimming classes suitable for all ages and abilities as well as a range of swimming activities during school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 19 November 2015: Standard registration
- WEST LEIGH SWIM SCHOOL LTD (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Packer | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HALLS | Trustee | 19 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL WOOLF | Trustee | 19 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.64k | £132.13k | £132.40k | £88.88k | £47.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.92k | £131.38k | £132.36k | £89.82k | £51.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/01/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF SWIMMING (INCLUDING ITS INSTRUCTION) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BOTH WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN LEIGH-ON-SEA, ESSEX.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seagrave & Partners
Turnpike House
1208-1210 London Road
Leigh-on-Sea
SS9 2UA
- Phone:
- 01702477444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window