Financial history HIGHGATE WOOD SCHOOL PSA

Charity Number: 1161094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £49.42k £42.60k £52.53k £35.02k £30.35k
Total expenditure £52.50k £45.05k £4.17k £9.32k £10.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A