ONE CHILD FOUNDATION (SRI LANKA) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty among the destitute children in Sri Lanka and offer education as the most effective way to escape their cycle of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 19 May 2015: Standard registration
- ONE CHILD FOUNDATION (SRI LANKA)LTD (Previous name)
- ONE CHILD FOUNDATION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH MANOHARAN MANUELPILLAI | Chair | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIDIA SUBOTHINEE TIMOTHY | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
IVOR EMMANUEL SHANTHAKUMAR | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.49k | £67.55k | £47.25k | £71.59k | £155.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.11k | £67.53k | £50.00k | £68.57k | £125.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 March 2025 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR DESTITUTE CHILDREN IN SRI LANKA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Galley Lane
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 4AR
- Phone:
- 07871452720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window