WALKING WITH IN NORTH TYNESIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide relief for refugees, asylum seekers,those without status, and others who are in condition of need, hardship and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 18 March 2016: Standard registration
- WALKING WITH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Victor Hood | Chair | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Innes Thompson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Kathleen McKenzzie | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wylie | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Jamieson | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Enid Muriel Gordon | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Malcolm Railton Treasurer | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN LOUISE MADDEN | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.20k | £137.31k | £139.31k | £136.81k | £190 | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.24k | £124.83k | £104.93k | £121.95k | £1.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.00k | £11.00k | £12.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2016 as amended on 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
2.01 THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WHO ARE REFUGEES, AND WHO RESIDE IN NORTH TYNESIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; 2.02 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING: EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE; SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; 2.03 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NORTH TYNESIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church House
Hugh Street
WALLSEND
NE28 6RL
- Phone:
- 0191 6498974
- Email:
- Joan@walkingwith.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window