Financial history 7TH SOUTH LEEDS (ROTHWELL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.18k £21.95k £14.98k £16.75k £21.85k
Total expenditure £15.51k £10.55k £5.99k £15.61k £19.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A