THE DANCERS' FORGET ME NOT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dancers' Forget-Me-Not Fund is a charity that provides gifts to bona-fide Ballroom, Latin-American, Old-Time and Sequence dancers, of all grades from social dancer to professional competitor or teacher or any individual involved in the promotion of dance, who have been prevented from their normal dancing activity as a result of accident, illness, or other debilitating condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 2015: Standard registration
- THE DANCERS' FORGET-ME-NOT FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Michael Jones | Chair | 27 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Janet Mary Holloway | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cheetham Baxter | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hillier | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stefanie Bossen Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM DURRANT | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|||||
SANDRA IRENA DEAR | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £4.25k | £8.39k | £8.43k | £12.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £1.72k | £9.65k | £10.48k | £14.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2015 as amended on 24 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
“To promote the mental or physical health of any ballroom, latin, old time or modern sequence dancer, whether they are social, competitive or professional dancers that are (or have recently been) prevented from going about their normal dancing activity as a result of a debilitating illness or condition and who have been nominated by a friend or teacher, by the provision of a gift”
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dellwood
Tompsets Bank
FOREST ROW
East Sussex
RH18 5LN
- Phone:
- 01342 823348
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window