MEIR HEATH AND ROUGH CLOSE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of buildings, facilities and open space for use by local and wider community for a range of recreation/sports and other activities. i.e. art/lace making/karate/dance/aerobics classes. Indoor bowls, tumble tots (pe for infants). WI/Towns Women's Guild, parish council. Police & community meetings. Parties/weddings etc. Conferences/exhibitions, polling station (elections).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 March 1977: Standard registration
- THE MEIR HEATH AND ROUGH CLOSE VILLAGE HALL DEVELOPMENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN HILL | Chair | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Wesley Walker | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hill | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JILL PROBYN | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM FRANK WINFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE ANN SHOTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FULFORD PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.52k | £384 | £9.51k | £15.32k | £15.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.90k | £19.31k | £17.10k | £13.17k | £20.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MEIR HEATH AND ROUGH CLOSE AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MEIR HEATH AND ROUGH CLOSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LEADENDALE LANE
ROUGH CLOSE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST3 7NJ
- Phone:
- 01782974047
- Email:
- jendy.22@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window