DARTFORD AREA SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The DASCo membership works together in a constructive and challenging way to anticipate and prevent problems, in order to raise the quality of education and outcomes in Dartford, through a self-improving school system evidenced through: ? The achievement of all pupils (attainment and progress) ? Ofsted school grading ? every school at least good and aspiring to be outstanding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- DASCO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.93k | £51.99k | £26.72k | £38.70k | £5.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.52k | £45.44k | £21.33k | £20.51k | £42.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT DASCO MEMBER SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION SERVICES INCLUDING: - BY PROVIDING LEADERSHIP TRAINING - BY PROVIDING TEACHER TRAINING - BY PROVIDING SUPPORT STAFF TRAINING - BY PROVIDING LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE - BY PROVIDING GOVERNOR TRAINING - BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES - BY ORGANISING NETWORKS AND SUPPORT GROUPS - BY PROMOTING SCHOOL TO SCHOOL COLLABORATION - BY DEVELOPING AND SHARING GOOD PRACTICE - BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH - BY WORKING WITH OTHER SCHOOL COLLABORATIONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window