BAT CONSERVATION AND RESEARCH UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation and protection of bats and in doing so to improve their conservation status, in particular but not exclusively by: a) improving bat roosts, feeding areas and habitats b) conducting conservation projects c) carrying out research and making available grants for research pertaining to bats d) providing training and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 2015: CIO registration
- BATCRU (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL WHITBY | Chair | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte de Coriolis | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
LISA WHITBY | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.83k | £2.29k | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £503 | £3.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 November 2024 | 547 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 November 2024 | 547 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF BATS AND IN DOING SO TO IMPROVE THEIR CONSERVATION STATUS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) IMPROVING BAT ROOSTS, FEEDING AREAS AND HABITATS; B) CONDUCTING CONSERVATION PROJECTS; C) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND MAKING AVAILABLE GRANTS FOR RESEARCH PERTAINING TO BATS; D) PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION FOR THOSE WORKING TO PROTECT BATS OR UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO BAT CONSERVATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birch Walk
Lower Street
Fittleworth
PULBOROUGH
RH20 1JE
- Phone:
- 08452505585
- Email:
- contact@batcru.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window