Accounts and annual returns AMATE ANIMALIA

Charity number: 1164303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 28 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 March 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 29 March 2021 119 days late Download Open in new window