MUSEUM OF HOMELESSNESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum of Homelessness operates nationally. MoH is an independent charity that is responsive to the day to day realities of homelessness. The museum has been created by people with direct experience of homelessness to collect and share the art, history and culture of homelessness and housing in order to change society today.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 October 2015: CIO registration
- MUSEUM OF HOMELESSNESS (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hetty Tapper | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sandell | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Forshaw | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eva Somali Datta | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amara Sharif | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ribunal | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martha Gabriella Spurrier | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Minott | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aderonke Apata | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jane Cook | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Heal | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.21k | £191.99k | £109.25k | £283.09k | £496.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.71k | £102.82k | £198.63k | £119.53k | £377.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND UNDERTAKE RESEARCH ON HOMELESSNESS, INCLUDING ITS HISTORY, CAUSES AND IMPACT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM ON HOMELESSNESS; 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE AND OTHERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED IN ENGLAND AND WALES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, GRANTS AND ACCOMMODATION. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Museum Of Homelessness
The Manor House Lodge
Seven Sisters Road
LONDON
N4 2DE
- Phone:
- 07730515821
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window