Accounts and annual returns FAB FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1165181
Charity reporting is overdue by 1179 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Annual return 06 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Annual return 06 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
Annual return 06 April 2021 29 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1179 days
Annual return 06 April 2020 29 March 2022 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 29 March 2022 416 days late Download Open in new window