Accounts and annual returns PEOPLE ACTIVITIES COMMUNITY ACHIEVEMENT

Charity number: 1161509
Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 April 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 29 April 2024 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 28 June 2023 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 28 June 2023 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 31 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 31 March 2022 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 March 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 12 March 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window