ASMARA FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of sport and entertainment activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 September 2015: CIO registration
- AFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSSIE GEBREMEDHIN | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HENOK ABRAHAM | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
EYOB GHEBREZGABHER | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £13.67k | £5.37k | £8.82k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.72k | £13.70k | £2.10k | £6.41k | £8.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.04k | £7.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 23 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR ERITREAN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O EKB ACCOUNTANCY SERVICES
OMNIBUS BUSINESS CENTRE
39-41 NORTH ROAD
LONDON
N7 9DP
- Phone:
- 02076071471
- Email:
- asmarafc@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window