Accounts and annual returns LIGHTHOUSE ORGANISATION NETWORK
Charity number: 1161916

Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1345 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1345 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window