HOME4U CARDIFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home4U Cardiff appeals to property owners in the Cardiff area, asking if they can suitable properties, in good condition and with appropriate facilities, available for a specific period to asylum seekers and refugees who are currently homeless and destitute. The trustees make appropriate agreements with the property owners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £11,229 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 12 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gauri Rosebind Taylor-Nayar | Chair | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Shuna Miah | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Sabiha Azad | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Elizabeth Willmington | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Princess Onyeanusi | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Nirushan Sudarsan | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
His Honour Nicholas Cooke | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARY O'NEILL | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.55k | £149.32k | £83.61k | £81.83k | £87.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.97k | £58.07k | £104.70k | £107.00k | £117.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | £42.38k | £20.61k | £11.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF HOME4U CARDIFF ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES IN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE WITH, THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Meteor Street
CARDIFF
CF24 0HX
- Phone:
- 07878173681
- Email:
- info@home4ucardiff.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window