Trustees THE WILBERFORCE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1169450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Richard Derek Bangham Chair 09 July 2015
None on record
George Stokes Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Moni Owoade Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Jemima Baar Trustee 15 April 2020
None on record
NICHOLAS CRAWFORD Trustee 03 October 2016
None on record
MICHAEL CAMPBELL Trustee 09 July 2015
None on record