WE ARE FAMILY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Are Family is a parent-led, peer-to-peer adoption support community, that promote the health and well-being of prospective adopters and adoptive parents mainly in the London area, and in particular the relief of the predictable stress, strain and sense of isolation. Our members meet regularly through core activities such as playgroups for under-fives, parent support groups or family outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,375 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 August 2015: CIO registration
- WAF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK TREFOR HOULT-ALLEN | Chair | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Claire Walsh | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Louise Gillbanks | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Antoinette Goveas | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jane Burns-Thomson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Clarke | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esi Leah Cathline | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Willow | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jayne Hocter | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barabara Diane McGrath | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Taylor-Dawson | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.36k | £88.56k | £100.29k | £99.29k | £125.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.28k | £62.76k | £76.06k | £103.11k | £114.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.13k | £29.81k | £52.56k | £52.90k | £55.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 26 AUG 2015 AMENDED ON 20 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2022 AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF WE ARE FAMILY, AS A PARENT-LED, PEER-TO-PEER ADOPTION SUPPORT COMMUNITY, ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PROSPECTIVE ADOPTERS AND ADOPTIVE PARENTS AND THE PARTNERS OF ADOPTIVE PARENTS WHO WERE NOT PARTY TO THE ORIGINAL ADOPTION ORDER (THESE THREE GROUPS BEING REFERRED TO TOGETHER AS ‘ADOPTIVE PARENTS’ IN THESE OBJECTS) THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF THE PREDICTABLE STRESS, STRAIN AND SENSE OF ISOLATION THAT COMES WITH BECOMING AN ADOPTIVE PARENT AND IN PARENTING TRAUMATIZED CHILDREN. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY : (A) ADVOCATING AND ADVANCING PEER-TO-PEER SUPPORT FOR ADOPTIVE PARENTS, BEFORE, DURING AND AFTER PLACEMENT AND ADOPTION; (B) ADVOCATING, ESTABLISHING, SUPPORTING, RUNNING AND PROMOTING PARENT-LED COMMUNITIES OF ADOPTIVE PARENTS, CONSISTING OF LOCALLY AND CENTRALLY MANAGED NETWORKS WHICH ALLOW FOR PARTICIPATION BY WAY OF BOTH IN-PERSON AND ONLINE MEETINGS AND FORUMS; (C) OFFERING LOCAL AND REGULAR MEETING PLACES AND ACTIVITIES FOR ADOPTIVE PARENTS WHICH REFLECT THEIR PARTICULAR NEEDS, WITH OR WITHOUT THEIR CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RUNNING SUCH ACTIVITIES AS UNDER-5S PLAYGROUPS AND FAMILY EVENTS (WITH CHILDREN) AND PARENT SUPPORT GROUPS (WITHOUT CHILDREN); (D) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE NEED FOR PARENTAL SELF-CARE WHILE RAISING CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED EARLY TRAUMA (SELF-CARE MEANING LOOKING AFTER ADOPTIVE PARENTS’ OWN EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS TO ALLOW THEM TO BETTER CARE FOR AND SUPPORT THEIR ADOPTED CHILDREN, INCLUDING BY HELPING THEM REMAIN EMOTIONALLY REGULATED AND STABLE IN THEIR INTERACTIONS WITH THEIR CHILDREN); (E) PROVIDING PLATFORMS FOR ADOPTIVE PARENTS TO SHARE THEIR EXPERIENCES, FOR EXAMPLE THROUGH PARENT SUPPORT FORA AND ONLINE BLOGS; (F) DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ABOUT PRACTICAL ADOPTION SUPPORT AND RELATED TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES (SUCH AS WAYS OF RELIEVING STRESS AND REDUCING ISOLATION); AND (G) SUPPORTING, INFLUENCING, ADVOCATING FOR, AND CONTRIBUTING TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF RELEVANT ADOPTION SUPPORT SERVICES AND ADVANCING PARENTAL SUPPORT THROUGHOUT THE ADOPTION PROCESS AND BEYOND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27
Old Gloucester Street
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 020 7135 2037
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window