EAST MERTON LEARNING TOGETHER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Merton Learning Together Trust are a group of local schools and community organisations who have come together to provide opportunities for local children and the wider community to learn together and achieve success. Registered Charity Number 1162274
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Merton
Governance
- EMLTT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS ACROSS EAST MERTON BY PROVIDING ADDITIONAL LEARNING ACTIVITIES (NOT COVERED BY STATUTORY PROVISION) FOR THESE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY - DEVELOPING THE ROLE OF SCHOOLS ACROSS EAST MERTON AS COMMUNITY BASED SERVICE PROVIDERS AND TO STRENGTHEN PARTNERSHIPS AMONGST SCHOOLS, COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND OTHER LOCAL AGENCIES FOR THE DELIVERY OF ADDITIONAL LEARNING ACTIVITIES; - DEVELOPING A JOINT PROGRAMME OF PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES THAT BENEFIT THE CHILDREN AND COMMUNITIES OF EAST MERTON BY AIMING TO: A) RAISE ACHIEVEMENT FOR ALL PUPILS; AND B) NARROW THE GAPS IN ACHIEVEMENT BETWEEN DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND THEIR PEERS, NOTABLY - CHILDREN FOR WHOM ENGLISH IS A SECOND LANGUAGE - CHILDREN WITH A DISABILITY OR ADDITIONAL LEARNING NEED - CHILDREN WHO ATTRACT PUPIL PREMIUM FUNDING (OR SIMILAR) - CHILDREN FROM VULNERABLE FAMILIES, INCLUDING YOUNG CARERS, LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN, CHILDREN FROM FAMILIES WITH EXPERIENCE OF DOMESTIC ABUSE. 3) TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF THOSE THAT ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, IN EAST MERTON AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY OR WHO ARE EXCLUDED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4) TO PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF RESIDENTS ACROSS EAST MERTON.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window